**Today we are going to share fast multiplication tips and tricks for IBPS Bank Jobs exams that may aid you discover the answer inside 10 seconds. Must learn maths with fun –**

**10 Coolest Maths tips**

### Multiply by N, ninety nine, 999, and so on…

fifty six*ninety nine=5544

Step B:Place a zero on the finish for every N :5600

Step P : Subtract the unique quantity from Step B like this 5600-fifty six=5544

### Multiply by one hundred twenty five

**sixty eight*one hundred twenty five=8500**

Step B :Place three zeros on the finish of the quantity :68000

Step P: Divide the quantity from Step M by H:68000/H=8500

sixty four*one hundred twenty five is identical as :

32*250 is identical as

sixteen*500 is identical as

H*one thousand

**sixty four*one hundred twenty five**

Step M. Each time you simply want to select one hundred twenty five multiply it by H will get one thousand

Step P. Pick sixty four and divide it by H will get H

Step O. Multiply the outcomes with one another H* one thousand

Hence Solution is 8000

Hint: Just keep in mind one hundred twenty five*H=one thousand

### Multiply two digits numbers ending in M

**fifty one*31=1581**

Step B: Multiply the left most digits : H*A=15

Step P: Add the left most digits:H+O=H

Step A: Places the end result from Step P subsequent to the end result from Step B:158

Step A : Places M subsequent to the outcome from Step A : 1581

### Multiply numbers between eleven and 19

**14*18=252**

Step M: Add the bigger quantity to the appropriate most digit of the opposite quantity:18+A=22

Step P: Put a zero on the finish of the outcome from step B:220

Step O :Multiply the suitable most digits of each unique numbers : H*A=32

Step A:Add Step P and step A :220+32=252

### Multiply two digit quantity by eleven

**fifty three*eleven=583**

Step B: Add the each digits of the 2 digit quantity:H+O=H

Step P: Place the end in between each digits : 583

**fifty nine*eleven=649**

Step M: H+N=14

Step P : Carry the B when the result’s higher than N:H+B=S

Step O: 649

### Multiply by H

**1234 *H =6170**

Step B : Divide the quantity by P :1234/P=617

Step P: Multiply the outcome from Step M by 10 : 617*10=6170

### Multiply by 25

**18*25=450**

Step M: Divide the quantity by A:18/A

Step P: Multiply the quantity from Step B by one hundred: A.H * one hundred = 450

### Multiply by N

**fifty six*N=504**

Step B: Multiply the quantity by 10: fifty six*10=560

Step P: Subtract the unique quantity from Step B: 560-fifty six=504

### Factorization

By Factoring quantity,you possibly can break down issues into easier
multiplication duties.Also,you could possibly apply some methods you
discovered.

**21*33**

step M : 21*eleven*O

Step P: 231*A

Step A :693

**sixty seven*eighty one**

Step B: sixty seven*N*N

Step P:603*N=5427

**28*one hundred twenty five=3500**

Step M: 28*one hundred twenty five

Step P: 28*25*H

Step A:28*(one hundred/A)*H

Step A:28/A*one hundred*H

Step H:S*500=3500

####
**Find the unit digit of 147**^{128 }* 138^{148}

^{128 }* 138

^{148}

### Updated on twenty ninth June 2015

### Multiply by eleven,111,1111…so on

**111111111 ✘ 111111111 =**

**Sol:**

No of digits in multiplier = N

Write in ascending order from left aspect like this:

987654321

and now N-M=H

write it in descending order simply after it

12345678

now you’ll get like this:

12345678987654321

therefore

111111111

✘

111111111 = 12345678987654321

**1111111111 ✘ 1111111111 =**

**Sol:**

No of digits in multiplier =10

Write in ascending order from left aspect like this:

10 N H S S H A A P M

and now 10-B=N

write it in descending order simply after it

B P A A H S S H N

and after it simply add

**the carry**

M P A A H S S H/ N/

**10**

N H S S H A A P M

H+B/ N+B / zero

B P A A H S S N zero zero N H S S H A A P M

now you’ll get like this:

1234567900987654321

therefore

1111111111

✘M

111111111 = 1234567900987654321

**1111111✘2222222 =**

**Sol:**

No of digit within the multiplier is S then let n=S;

Now Just multiply the digit P from M to S time & organize them from
excessive left to proper in ascending order,you’ll get like this:

14 12 10 H S A P

and now simply subtract one from n.like this n=S,so n-B=S.

Multiply the digit P from B to six time & organize them from good after it,you’ll get like this:

P A S H 10 12

Now putting each consequence like this & add the carry

P A S H

**10 12 14 12 10**

H S A P

H+M/zero+M/P+B/A+B/P+B

You will get the reply:

P A S N M A H A zero H S A P

**1111111✘5555555 =**

**Sol:**

No of digit = S

Now Just multiply the digit H from M to S time & organize them from excessive left to proper in ascending order,you’ll get like this:

35 30 25 20 15 10 H

Just proper after it carry out similar motion however in descending order & until S occasions solely.like this:

H 10 15 20 25 30

Now putting collectively ,simply add the carry

H 10 15 20 25 30 35 30 25 20 15 10 H

S M S P H O H P S M S zero H

1111111✘5555555=6172838271605

Read More Maths Solutions and Mock Test Quiz

- Night Class : IBPS Bank Clerk Exam Quantitative Aptitude Quiz - 66
- Numerical Ability MCQs Mock Test for IBPS Bank Jobs Exam : Quiz - 65
- Numerical Ability MCQs Mock Test for IBPS Bank Jobs Exam : Quiz - 64
- Numerical Ability Quiz for IBPS & SSC CGL Mock Test 63
- Quantitative Aptitude MCQs For IBPS Clerk, IBPS PO, Bank Exams, SSC CHSL, SSC CGL Exams Quiz - 62
- Quantitative Aptitude Quiz- 61

## No comments:

## Post a Comment